Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Re-referred to Committee in Second House to Senate State Governmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Pending Senate State Governmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Pending Senate Local Legislation | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 294 | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Re-referred to Committee in House of Origin to House State Government | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Pending House Local Legislation | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation | ||
House | 09/11/2024 | Prefiled |