Senate | 03/19/2025 | Enacted | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 372 | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 371 7BB382V-1 | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Public Safety and Homeland Security Engrossed Substitute Offered 7BB382V-1 | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House from House Public Safety and Homeland Security 7BB382V-1 | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Public Safety and Homeland Security 1st Amendment RBBPAYM-1 | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Pending House Public Safety and Homeland Security | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 180 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Smitherman motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 179 SLLJS77-1 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Smitherman 1st Amendment Offered SLLJS77-1 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Pending Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |