House | 05/01/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Pending House County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 836 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Barfoot motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 835 RBG7XNN-1 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Judiciary 1st Amendment Offered RBG7XNN-1 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Judiciary 1st Amendment RBG7XNN-1 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Pending Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |