Alabama 2025 Regular Session

Alabama Senate Bill SB250 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/18/2025

                            SB250INTRODUCED
Page 0
SB250
YMBDP62-1
By Senators Smitherman, Coleman-Madison, Coleman, Waggoner (N
& P)
RFD: Jefferson County Legislation
First Read: 18-Mar-25
1
2
3
4
5
6 YMBDP62-1 03/13/2025 OW (L)cr 2025-613
Page 1
First Read: 18-Mar-25
A BILL
TO BE ENTITLED
AN ACT
Relating to Jefferson County; to amend Section
45-37-230, Code of Alabama 1975, to provide further for the
compensation of the sheriff.
BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA:
Section 1. Section 45-37-230, Code of Alabama 1975, is
amended to read as follows: 
"ยง45-37-230
(a) Effective beginning the next term of office
Beginning on January 14, 2019 , the annual salary of the
Sheriff of Jefferson County shall be one hundred sixty
thousand dollars ($160,000).
(b) Effective beginning the next term of office
Beginning on January 14, 2019 , the sheriff shall receive the
same cost-of-living increases provided to deputy sheriffs in
Jefferson County granted after that date.
(c)(1) Effective beginning on June 1, 2025, the sheriff
shall receive an additional expense allowance of forty
thousand dollars ($40,000) per year, payable in equal monthly
installments from the general fund of the county.
(2) This expense allowance shall be in addition to all
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28 SB250 INTRODUCED
Page 2
(2) This expense allowance shall be in addition to all
other compensation or benefits received by the sheriff and may
be treated as compensation for retirement contributions.
(d) Effective beginning January 18, 2027, with the next
term of office, the annual salary of the sheriff shall be two
hundred forty-eight thousand dollars ($248,000), and the
compensation provided for in subsections (a) and (c) shall be
void."
Section 2. This act shall become effective June 1,
2025.
29
30
31
32
33
34
35
36
37