Senate | 05/01/2025 | Delivered to Governor | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1131 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Carried Over to the Call of the Chair | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Pending House Economic Development and Tourism | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Economic Development and Tourism | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 723 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Smitherman motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 722 JPZTUNN-1 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Smitherman 1st Substitute Offered JPZTUNN-1 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |