Senate | 04/29/2025 | Delivered to Governor | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1040 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Pending House Local Legislation | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 771 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Pending Senate Local Legislation | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |