Senate | 02/25/2025 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Reported from Rules from House Rules | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Pending House Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Received in the House and referred to the House committee on Rules | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Waggoner motion to Adopt - Adopted Voice Vote | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Reported from RULES from Senate RULES | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Pending Senate RULES | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Received in the Senate and referred to the Senate committee on RULES |