House | 03/10/2023 | Notification that HB1005 is now Act 239 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | TO BE ENROLLED | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Returned From the Senate as passed. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Returned to the House as passed. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Read the third time and passed. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Received from the House. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Returned by the Committee Do Pass | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE | ||
House | 11/18/2022 | Filed |