House | 04/10/2023 | Notification that HB1275 is now Act 502 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | TO BE ENROLLED | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Returned From the Senate as passed. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Returned to the House as Passed. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Read the third time and passed. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Received from the House. | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Returned by the Committee Do Pass | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Filed |