House
|
04/11/2023
|
Notification that HB1312 is now Act 578
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
TO BE ENROLLED
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned From the Senate as passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned to the House as Passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Read the third time and passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from the House.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|