Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Notification that SB556 is now Act 788
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
ORDERED ENROLLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Returned from the House as passed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Returned To the Senate as passed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Motion by Rep. Duke to reconsider SB556 Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Read the third time and failed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned by the Committee Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Motion to expunge the vote by which SB556 passed. Motion Carried.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Read the third time and passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|