Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Notification that SB66 is now Act 612
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
House Amendment No. 1, 2, & 3 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned from the House as passed, as amended # 1, 2, & 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
ORDERED ENROLLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read the third time and passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from the House.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1, 2 & 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
The vote by which SB66 Passed was expunged.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Returned From the Senate as requested.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Returned to the House as requested.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Motion to Expunge passage and House amendments 1, 2, & 3. Motion Carried.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senate Bill 66 returned from the Governor as requested.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Requested the return of Senate Bill 66 from the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
House Amendment No. 1 & 2 & 3 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1, 2, & 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Returned From the House as passed, as amended # 1 & 2 & 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2 & 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Returned by the Committee Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Re-referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|