LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arkansas AR
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB66
Draft Versions
AR
Arkansas Senate Bill SB66
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arkansas 2023 Regular Session
Arkansas Senate Bill SB66
Drafts & Versions
Chaptered
Bill
April 17, 2023
Compare
Draft
Bill
April 3, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 7, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 2, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 9, 2023
Compare
Bill
January 30, 2023
Compare
Bill
January 17, 2023
Compare