Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Sine Die adjournment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned From the House as Failed to Pass
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned To the Senate having failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Read the third time and failed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Read the third time and passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|