Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Chapter 237
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Assigned to Senate ED Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
House Committee action: Do pass on reconsideration, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
House ED Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (5-5-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Assigned to House Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Assigned to House ED Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
12/28/2021
|
Prefile
|
|
|