Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2025 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 17, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022