Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (32-26-1-1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-5-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Assigned to House NREW Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Prefile
|
|
|