Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2055 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022