Senate | 03/08/2022 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-7-1-0) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-2-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-2-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time |