Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2110 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022