Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (40-17-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-1-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|