Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2111 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Bill January 10, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022