Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2112 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 3, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022