House
|
06/14/2022
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
House final reading FAILED, voting: (12-41-7-0)
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
House concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-0-5-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Senate COM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to Senate FIN Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to Senate COM Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Assigned to House COM Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|