Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2121 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 23, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 19, 2022
Analysis May 18, 2022
Analysis April 12, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022