Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2132 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022