Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Assigned to Senate COM Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (42-17-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-1-1-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|