Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2226 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 9, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022