Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
Senate third reading FAILED voting: (10-15-5-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Assigned to Senate FIN Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Assigned to Senate ED Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (32-27-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Assigned to House ED Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|