Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2290 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 16, 2022
Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 6, 2022
Bill February 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 6, 2022
Analysis May 31, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis March 20, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022