Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Chapter 202
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (46-11-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House concurs
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-8-3-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Assigned to Senate ED Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (52-7-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
House GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Assigned to House GE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|