Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2322 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 28, 2022
Analysis April 19, 2022
Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022