Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Chapter 243
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (43-10-7-0)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
House concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-1-3-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (42-16-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
House COM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Assigned to House GE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Assigned to House COM Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|