LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2323
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona House Bill HB2323
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2022 Regular Session
Arizona House Bill HB2323
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 13, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 27, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 16, 2022
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
May 23, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
May 16, 2022
Analysis
May 9, 2022
Analysis
May 2, 2022
Analysis
April 29, 2022
Analysis
March 25, 2022
Analysis
March 17, 2022
Analysis
February 17, 2022
Analysis
February 15, 2022