Senate | 03/16/2022 | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-2-0) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Assigned to House LARA Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time |