Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2334 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022