Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2344 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-House Engrossed military affairs commission; continuation State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022 CHAPTER 67 HOUSE BILL 2344 An Act repealing section 41-3022.14, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.14; relating to the military affairs commission. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
1+House Engrossed military affairs commission; continuation State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022 HOUSE BILL 2344 An Act repealing section 41-3022.14, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.14; relating to the military affairs commission. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
2+
3+
24
35
46
57
68
79 House Engrossed military affairs commission; continuation
810 State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022
9-CHAPTER 67
1011 HOUSE BILL 2344
1112
1213 House Engrossed
1314
1415
1516
1617 military affairs commission; continuation
18+
19+
1720
1821
1922
2023
2124
2225
2326
2427 State of Arizona
2528
2629 House of Representatives
2730
2831 Fifty-fifth Legislature
2932
3033 Second Regular Session
3134
3235 2022
3336
3437
3538
3639
3740
41+HOUSE BILL 2344
3842
3943
40-CHAPTER 67
41-
42-
43-
44-HOUSE BILL 2344
4544
4645
4746
4847
4948
5049 An Act
5150
5251
5352
5453 repealing section 41-3022.14, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.14; relating to the military affairs commission.
5554
5655
5756
5857
5958
6059 (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
6160
6261
6362
6463 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3022.14, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.14, to read: START_STATUTE41-3030.14. Military affairs commission; termination July 1, 2030 A. The military affairs commission terminates on july 1, 2030. B. Section 26-261 and this section are repealed on january 1, 2031. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the military affairs commission to monitor military issues in this state, including matters affecting the military installations in this state. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2022.
6564
6665 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:
6766
6867 Section 1. Repeal
6968
7069 Section 41-3022.14, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.
7170
7271 Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.14, to read:
7372
7473 START_STATUTE41-3030.14. Military affairs commission; termination July 1, 2030
7574
7675 A. The military affairs commission terminates on july 1, 2030.
7776
7877 B. Section 26-261 and this section are repealed on january 1, 2031. END_STATUTE
7978
8079 Sec. 3. Purpose
8180
8281 Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the military affairs commission to monitor military issues in this state, including matters affecting the military installations in this state.
8382
8483 Sec. 4. Retroactivity
8584
8685 Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2022.
87-
88- APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MARCH 25, 2022. FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 25, 2022.
89-
90-
91-
92-
93-
94-
95-
96-APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MARCH 25, 2022.
97-
98-
99-
100-FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 25, 2022.