House Engrossed military affairs commission; continuation State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022 CHAPTER 67 HOUSE BILL 2344 An Act repealing section 41-3022.14, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.14; relating to the military affairs commission. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE) House Engrossed military affairs commission; continuation State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022 CHAPTER 67 HOUSE BILL 2344 House Engrossed military affairs commission; continuation State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022 CHAPTER 67 HOUSE BILL 2344 An Act repealing section 41-3022.14, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.14; relating to the military affairs commission. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE) Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3022.14, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.14, to read: START_STATUTE41-3030.14. Military affairs commission; termination July 1, 2030 A. The military affairs commission terminates on july 1, 2030. B. Section 26-261 and this section are repealed on january 1, 2031. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the military affairs commission to monitor military issues in this state, including matters affecting the military installations in this state. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2022. Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3022.14, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.14, to read: START_STATUTE41-3030.14. Military affairs commission; termination July 1, 2030 A. The military affairs commission terminates on july 1, 2030. B. Section 26-261 and this section are repealed on january 1, 2031. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the military affairs commission to monitor military issues in this state, including matters affecting the military installations in this state. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2022. APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MARCH 25, 2022. FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 25, 2022. APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MARCH 25, 2022. FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 25, 2022.