Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2494 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022