Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2498 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 26, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2022
Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022