Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2649 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022