Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Chapter 185
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Assigned to Senate COM Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (46-12-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (30-27-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
House COM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Assigned to House COM Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|