Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2674 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 26, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2022
Analysis April 13, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022