Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
Chapter 267
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (31-26-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
House concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (40-19-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-2-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|