LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2722
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona House Bill HB2722
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2022 Regular Session
Arizona House Bill HB2722
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 18, 2022
Compare
Bill
February 22, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
June 30, 2022
Analysis
March 28, 2022
Analysis
March 8, 2022
Analysis
February 22, 2022
Analysis
February 17, 2022
Analysis
February 14, 2022
Chaptered
Bill
May 31, 2022
Compare