Senate
|
07/01/2022
|
Chapter 336
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2022
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (48-1-11-0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2022
|
House concurs
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2022
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2022
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Assigned to Senate COM Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (52-7-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|