Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2741 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 23, 2022
Bill February 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 5, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 24, 2022
Analysis June 23, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 22, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022