Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCM2002 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022