House | 02/08/2022 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Assigned to House ED Committee | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time |