Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCM2003 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 9, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022